Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Victor-Felix Cardinal Bernadou

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1816Born
19 Dec 184024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Alger, Algeria
25 Jan 186245.5SelectedBishop of Gap, France
7 Apr 186245.7ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
29 Jun 186246.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
10 Jul 186246.0InstalledBishop of Gap, France
25 May 186750.9SelectedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
12 Jul 186751.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
3 Sep 186751.1InstalledArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
7 Jun 188669.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 188770.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
15 Nov 189175.3DiedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France

MicroData Summary for Victor-Felix Bernadou (VIAF: 24593307)
Victor-Felix Cardinal Bernadou (born , died ) Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastres, Archdiocese of Albi
Ordained PriestParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopCathedral, Castres, Archdiocese of Albi
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Sens, Archdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre)

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
  • a cardinal for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 513, and Page 582
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Jun 1886
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017