Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Anastase Pichenot

Deceased

Archbishop of Chambéry, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1816Born
13 Jun 184023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sens (-Auxerre), France
16 Mar 187053.3SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
27 Jun 187053.6ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
21 Aug 187053.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
25 Jun 187356.6SelectedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
25 Jul 187356.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
5 Oct 188063.9DiedArchbishop of Chambéry, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Anastase Pichenot (VIAF: 57654477)
Archbishop Pierre-Anastase Pichenot (born , died ) Archbishop of Chambéry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNuits-sous-Ravière
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sens, Archdiocese of Sens (-Auxerre)

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 198, and Page 535
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017