Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Marie-Denis-Anselme Nouvel de La Flèche, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1814Born
5 Jun 184126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Oct 187156.8SelectedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
22 Dec 187156.9ConfirmedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
4 Feb 187257.1Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
1 Jun 188772.4DiedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Marie-Denis-Anselme Nouvel de La Flèche
Bishop Charles-Marie-Denis-Anselme Nouvel de La Flèche O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained BishopAbbaye Sainte Marie de la Pierre-qui-Vire

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 227
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017