Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Rosset

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1830Born
7 May 185625.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 187645.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
26 Jun 187645.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Paros
24 Aug 187646.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paros
15 Nov 187646.2SelectedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
18 Dec 187646.3ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
8 Jun 190271.7DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Rosset (VIAF: 14760008)
Bishop Michel Rosset (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBetton-Bettonet
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chambéry, Archdiocese of Chambéry

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 373, and Page 441
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017