Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tarentaise

Dioecesis Tarantasiensis

United

To: Archdiocese of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise)



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise) (erected)
Archdiocese of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)
794ElevatedDiocese of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise) Archdiocese of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)
29 November 1801SuppressedArchdiocese of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise) (suppressed) Diocese of Chambéry
Diocese of Tarentaise
5 August 1825ErectedArchdiocese of Chambéry Diocese of Tarentaise (erected)
26 April 1966UnitedArchdiocese of Chambéry
Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne
Diocese of Tarentaise
Archdiocese of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tarentaise
194950,00052,34095.5%109511443818087ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014