Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspard-Augustin Laurent de Sainte-Agnès, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1725³BornChambery
1748¹22.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
2 Oct 177146.4SelectedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
16 Dec 177146.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
9 Feb 177246.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
23 Jul 178358.2DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspard-Augustin Laurent de Sainte-Agnès:
Archbishop Gaspard-Augustin Laurent de Sainte-Agnès O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 392
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015