Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anastasio Germonio

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1551Born
12 Nov 160756.7AppointedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
30 Dec 160756.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
4 Aug 162776.4DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

MicroData Summary for Anastasio Germonio (VIAF: 88352152)
Archbishop Anastasio Germonio (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSale delle Langhe, Diocese of Mondovi, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Cathedral, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Buried Place (Original)Escorial, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1608, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 326
  • ob: AT, 6 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017