Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eduardus de Sabaudia (Savoia-Achaya)

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 May 1371AppointedBishop of Belley, France
27 Nov 1375AppointedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
21 Feb 1386AppointedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
Feb 1395³DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eduardus de Sabaudia (Savoia-Achaya)
Archbishop Eduardus de Sabaudia (Savoia-Achaya) (died Feb 1395) Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 472, and Page 442
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast