Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Biolley

Deceased

Bishop of Tarentaise, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1846Born
22 May 186922.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 190761.2AppointedBishop of Tarentaise, France
29 Jan 190861.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tarentaise, France
10 Oct 191872.0DiedBishop of Tarentaise, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Biolley
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Biolley (born , died ) Bishop of Tarentaise

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHauteville-Gondon

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast