Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrien-Alexis Fodéré

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1838Born
4 Apr 186324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
21 Feb 190667.3AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
25 Feb 190667.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
27 Aug 192384.8DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

MicroData Summary for Adrien-Alexis Fodéré (VIAF: 230011939)
Bishop Adrien-Alexis Fodéré (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBessans

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 10
  • ln: AJ, 8 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017