Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emile-Christophe Enard

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1839Born
15 Jun 186223.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 189657.0SelectedBishop of Cahors, France
25 Jun 189657.0ConfirmedBishop of Cahors, France
8 Sep 189657.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
21 Feb 190666.6AppointedArchbishop of Auch, France
13 Mar 190767.7DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for Emile-Christophe Enard
Archbishop Emile-Christophe Enard (born , died ) Archbishop of Auch

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Villotte-sur-Aire

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 193
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Mar 2017