Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie-François Lamouroux

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Flour, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1834Born
7 Mar 185723.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 189258.1SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
11 Jul 189258.3ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
29 Sep 189258.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
12 Jul 190672.3DiedBishop of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie-François Lamouroux
Bishop Jean-Marie-François Lamouroux (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Flour

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurat

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017