Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gustave-Adolphe de Pélacot

Deceased

Archbishop of Chambéry, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1840Born
21 May 186423.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 189857.7SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
24 Mar 189857.7ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
29 Jun 189858.0Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
15 Apr 190766.8AppointedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
5 Aug 190767.1DiedArchbishop of Chambéry, France

MicroData Summary for Gustave-Adolphe de Pélacot (VIAF: 309575195)
Archbishop Gustave-Adolphe de Pélacot (born , died ) Archbishop of Chambéry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Puy, Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay
Ordained BishopCathedral, Le Puy, Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 563
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017