Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Constant-Ludovic-Marie Guillois

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

Titular Archbishop of Pessinus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1833Born
6 Jun 185724.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 189460.9SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
18 May 189461.2ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
11 Jul 189461.3Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
31 May 190774.2RetiredBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
31 May 190774.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pessinus
22 Oct 191077.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for Constant-Ludovic-Marie Guillois
Archbishop Constant-Ludovic-Marie Guillois (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Le Puy-en-Velay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMauron, Diocese of Vannes
Ordained BishopS. Pierre, Cathedral, Rennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017