Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Bécel

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1825Born
5 Apr 185125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Vannes, France
6 Jan 186640.4SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
22 Jun 186640.8ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
25 Jul 186640.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
6 Nov 189772.2DiedBishop of Vannes, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Bécel (VIAF: 89108969)
Bishop Jean-Marie Bécel (born , died ) Bishop of Vannes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeignon
Ordained BishopN.D. des Victoires, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 584
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017