Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathurin Picarda, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal

Titular Bishop of Paphus

Prefect of Sénégal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1845Born
13 Mar 187226.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
14 Jul 188742.1AppointedPrefect of Sénégal
19 Jul 188742.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal
19 Jul 188742.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
18 Sep 188742.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paphus
22 Jan 188943.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Mathurin Picarda
Bishop Mathurin Picarda C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMeslau, France
Ordained BishopParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 16.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 438
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018