Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Anne Dubreil

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1808BornToulouse
22 Dec 183224.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 186153.4SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
22 Jul 186153.5ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
8 Sep 186153.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
24 Oct 186355.8SelectedArchbishop of Avignon, France
21 Dec 186355.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Avignon, France
13 Jan 188072.0DiedArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Anne Dubreil:
Archbishop Louis-Anne Dubreil (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 135, and Page 584

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013