Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Marie-Olivier Epivent

Deceased

Bishop of Aire et Dax, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1805Born
19 Sep 182924.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Aug 185954.1SelectedBishop of Aire et Dax, France
26 Sep 185954.2ConfirmedBishop of Aire et Dax, France
20 Nov 185954.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aire et Dax, France
22 Jul 187671.0DiedBishop of Aire et Dax, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie-Olivier Epivent (VIAF: 120169408)
Bishop Louis-Marie-Olivier Epivent (born , died ) Bishop of Aire et Dax

EventPlace
Birth PlacePordic, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Brieuc, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 130
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017