Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Matthias-Alexandre Jacquemet

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1803Born
13 Aug 182622.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 184845.2SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
2 Apr 184945.5ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
29 Jul 184945.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
9 Dec 186966.2DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Matthias-Alexandre Jacquemet (VIAF: 37063267)
Bishop Antoine-Matthias-Alexandre Jacquemet (born , died ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrenoble
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 401
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017