Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Louis-Adolphe Dupuch

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1800BornBordeaux, France
27 May 182525.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 183838.3SelectedBishop of Alger, Algeria
13 Sep 183838.3ConfirmedBishop of Alger, Algeria
28 Oct 183838.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alger, Algeria
16 Mar 184645.8ResignedBishop of Alger, Algeria
11 Jul 185656.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Alger, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Louis-Adolphe Dupuch:
Bishop Antoine-Louis-Adolphe Dupuch (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alger

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013