Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René-François Soyer

Deceased

Bishop of Luçon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1767BornThouarcé
25 Sep 179124.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 181749.9SelectedBishop of Luçon, France
24 Sep 182154.0ConfirmedBishop of Luçon, France
21 Oct 182154.1Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
5 May 184577.6DiedBishop of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for René-François Soyer (VIAF: 197996186)
Bishop René-François Soyer (born , died ) Bishop of Luçon

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 244
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Aug 2016