Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Lacroix

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1795BornEntraygues-sur-Truyère
26 Aug 182024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
1 Nov 183742.0SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
12 Feb 183842.2ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
22 Apr 183842.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
6 Jul 187882.6RetiredBishop of Bayonne, France
11 Oct 188286.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Bayonne, France

MicroData Summary for François Lacroix:
Bishop François Lacroix (born , died ) Bishop of Bayonne

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013