Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume-Elisée Martial

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1796³BornBordeaux
21 Jun 182124.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 185861.8SelectedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
27 Sep 185861.9ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
21 Nov 185862.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
26 Dec 186165.1DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Elisée Martial:
Bishop Guillaume-Elisée Martial (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013