Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas-Marie Sergent

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1802BornCorbigny
11 Mar 182623.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 185552.8SelectedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
23 Mar 185552.9ConfirmedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
20 May 185553.0Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
26 Jul 1871³69.2DiedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas-Marie Sergent:
Bishop Nicolas-Marie Sergent (born , died ) Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 226

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013