Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexis-Jean-Marie Guilloux (Guillons)

Deceased

Archbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1819Born
11 Mar 184323.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 187051.0AppointedArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
25 Jan 187151.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
24 Oct 188566.3DiedArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Alexis-Jean-Marie Guilloux (Guillons) (VIAF: 14612997)
Archbishop Alexis-Jean-Marie Guilloux (Guillons) (born , died ) Archbishop of Port-au-Prince

EventPlace
Birth PlacePloërmel, France
Ordained BishopPloërmel

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 467
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,871, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast