Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marc Le Breton

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1805Born
20 Sep 182823.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 186358.0SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
28 Sep 186358.4ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
15 Nov 186358.5Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
20 May 188681.0DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marc Le Breton (VIAF: 68920632)
Bishop Pierre-Marc Le Breton (born , died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

EventPlace
Birth PlacePléven
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Brieuc, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017