Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Baptist (Jean-Baptiste) Salpointe

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe, New Mexico

Titular Archbishop of Constantia in Scythia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1825BornSaint Maurice Poinsat, France
20 Dec 185126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Clermont, France
25 Sep 186843.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Arizona, USA
25 Sep 186843.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
20 Jun 186944.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
22 Apr 188459.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
3 Oct 188459.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
18 Aug 188560.5SucceededArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
7 Jan 189468.9ResignedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
27 Jan 189468.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Constantia in Scythia
15 Jul 189873.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA

MicroData Summary for John Baptist (Jean-Baptiste) Salpointe:
Archbishop John Baptist (Jean-Baptiste) Salpointe (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 98, and Page 250
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 271, and Page 558

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013