Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Chrysostom Matz

Deceased

Bishop of Denver, Colorado, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1850Born
31 May 187424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Colorado, USA
19 Aug 188737.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
19 Aug 188737.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Telmissus
28 Oct 188737.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Telmissus
10 Jul 188939.2SucceededBishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
9 Aug 191767.3DiedBishop of Denver, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Chrysostom Matz
Bishop Nicholas Chrysostom Matz (born , died ) Bishop of Denver

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMunster, France
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Denver, Diocese of Denver, Colorado

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 241, and Page 539
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,887, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast