Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Henry Tihen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Denver, Colorado

Titular Bishop of Bosana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1861BornOldenburg, IN
26 Apr 188624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
1888²26.4IncardinatedPriest of Wichita, Kansas, USA
12 May 191149.8AppointedBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
6 Jul 191149.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
21 Sep 191756.1AppointedBishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
21 Dec 191756.4InstalledBishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
6 Jan 193169.4ResignedBishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
6 Jan 193169.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bosana
14 Jan 194078.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Denver, Colorado, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Henry Tihen:
Bishop John Henry Tihen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Denver

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015