Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Scannell

Deceased

Bishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1845Born
26 Feb 187125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
9 Aug 188742.2AppointedBishop of Concordia, Kansas, USA
30 Nov 188742.5Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia, Kansas, USA
30 Jan 189145.7AppointedBishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
8 Jan 191670.6DiedBishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Scannell
Bishop Richard Scannell (born , died ) Bishop of Omaha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCloyne, Diocese of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Nashville, Diocese of Nashville, Tennessee

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 222, and Page 426
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018