Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph (James) Rademacher

Deceased

Bishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1840Born
2 Aug 186322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
3 Apr 188342.3AppointedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
24 Jun 188342.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
14 Jul 189352.6AppointedBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
12 Jun 190059.5DiedBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph (James) Rademacher
Bishop Joseph (James) Rademacher (born , died ) Bishop of Fort Wayne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWestphalia, MI, Diocese of Detroit, Michigan
Ordained BishopCathedral, Nashville, Diocese of Nashville, Tennessee

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 402, and Page 597
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017