Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gregory Dwenger, C.Pp.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1837Born
4 Sep 185922.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Precious Blood
15 Feb 187234.8AppointedBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
14 Apr 187235.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
22 Jan 189355.7DiedBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gregory Dwenger (VIAF: 55855009)
Bishop Joseph Gregory Dwenger C.Pp.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Fort Wayne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint John's, OH, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio
Ordained BishopSt Peter in Chains, Cathedral, Cincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 597
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017