Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Whitfield

Deceased

Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland

Apostolic Administrator of Richmond, Virginia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1770BornLiverpool, Great Britain
24 Jul 180938.7Ordained PriestPriest
1828²57.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Richmond, Virginia, USA
8 Jan 182857.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
8 Jan 182857.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Apollonia
29 Jan 182857.2SucceededArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
25 May 182857.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
19 Oct 183463.9DiedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Whitfield (VIAF: 12195619)
Archbishop James Whitfield (born , died ) Archbishop of Baltimore

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 81, and Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Aug 2016