Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Conwell

Deceased

Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1748¹BornBallyriff, Ireland
Nov 1776²28.8Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 181971.9AppointedBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Sep 182072.7Ordained BishopBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
26 Nov 182072.9InstalledBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Apr 184294.3DiedBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henry Conwell
Bishop Henry Conwell (born 1748, died ) Bishop of Philadelphia

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 305
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 May 2016