Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Thomas Heyden

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Natchez, Mississippi, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1798¹Born
21 May 182123.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 183739.5AppointedBishop of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
1838¹40.0ResignedBishop-Elect of Natchez, Mississippi, USA
25 Aug 187072.6DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Natchez, Mississippi, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Heyden
Father Thomas Heyden (born 1798, died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Natchez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarlow, Ireland

  • a priest for 49.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,837
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,840, Page 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast