Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Samuel Eccleston, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA


Motto: Auspice Maria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1801Born
29 May 181917.9Converted
24 Apr 182523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
11 Mar 183432.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
11 Mar 183432.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thermae Basilicae
14 Sep 183433.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thermae Basilicae
19 Oct 183433.3SucceededArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
19 Oct 183433.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Richmond, Virginia, USA
22 Nov 184039.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Richmond, Virginia, USA
22 Apr 185149.8DiedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary
Samuel Eccleston
Archbishop Samuel Eccleston P.S.S.
(born , died )
Archbishop of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChestertown, MD, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained PriestBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Death PlaceGeorgetown

  • a priest for 25.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 104, and Page 366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1834, Number 35
  • c1: CB, 11 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 19 May 2025