Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Gartland

Deceased

Bishop of Savannah, Georgia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1808BornDublin, Ireland
5 Aug 183224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
23 Jul 185042.5AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
10 Nov 185042.8Ordained BishopBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
20 Sep 185446.7DiedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Gartland:
Bishop Francis Xavier Gartland (born , died ) Bishop of Savannah

  • a priest for 22.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 503

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013