Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Vincent Whelan

Deceased

Bishop of Wheeling, West Virginia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1809BornBaltimore, MD
1 May 183122.3Ordained PriestPriest of Richmond, Virginia, USA
15 Dec 184031.9AppointedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
21 Mar 184132.1Ordained BishopBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
23 Jul 185041.5AppointedBishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
8 Dec 185041.9InstalledBishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
7 Jul 187465.4DiedBishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Vincent Whelan:
Bishop Richard Vincent Whelan (born , died ) Bishop of Wheeling

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 598
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013