Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Bernard Fitzpatrick

Deceased

Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1812BornBoston
13 Jun 184027.6Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
21 Nov 184331.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
21 Nov 184331.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Callipolis
24 Mar 184431.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callipolis
11 Aug 184633.7SucceededBishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
13 Feb 186653.2DiedBishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for John Bernard Fitzpatrick:
Bishop John Bernard Fitzpatrick (born , died ) Bishop of Boston

  • a priest for 25.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 116, and Page 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013