Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Patrick McFarland

Deceased

Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1819Born
18 May 184526.0Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
23 Apr 184728.0IncardinatedPriest of Albany, New York, USA
9 Jan 185737.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Florida, USA
8 Jan 185838.7AppointedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
14 Mar 185838.9Ordained BishopBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
12 Oct 187455.4DiedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Francis Patrick McFarland
Bishop Francis Patrick McFarland (born , died ) Bishop of Hartford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFranklin, PA
Ordained PriestSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York City, Diocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Providence, Diocese of Hartford, Connecticut

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017