Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Timon, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Buffalo, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1797BornConewago, PA
10 Jun 182528.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
23 Sep 182629.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
17 May 183942.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
7 Jun 183942.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vera
12 Apr 184043.2AppointedPrefect of Texas, USA
23 Apr 184750.2AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
17 Oct 184750.7Ordained BishopBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
16 Apr 186770.2DiedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for John Timon:
Bishop John Timon C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Buffalo

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 161, and Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013