Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rupert Seidenbusch, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Saint Cloud, Minnesota

Titular Bishop of Alia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1830BornMunich, Germany
6 Jan 185221.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Jun 185322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Feb 187544.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Minnesota, USA
12 Feb 187544.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Alia
30 May 187544.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alia
19 Oct 188858.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Northern Minnesota, USA
3 Jun 189564.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Rupert Seidenbusch:
Bishop Rupert Seidenbusch O.S.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Saint Cloud

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013