Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Marty, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1834BornSchwyz, Switzerland
20 May 185521.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Sep 185622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Aug 187945.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberias
12 Aug 187945.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dakota, USA
1 Feb 188046.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberias
26 Nov 188955.9AppointedBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
21 Jan 189561.0AppointedBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
19 Sep 189662.7DiedBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Martin Marty:
Bishop Martin Marty O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Cloud

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 211, and Page 521
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 552

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013