Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Silas Marean Chatard

Deceased

Bishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1834Born
14 Jun 186227.5Ordained PriestPriest
1868¹33.0AppointedRector of the Pontifical North American College
26 Mar 187843.2AppointedBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
12 May 187843.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
11 Aug 187843.6InstalledBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
28 Mar 189863.2AppointedBishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
7 Sep 191883.7DiedBishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Silas Marean Chatard (VIAF: 89437596)
Bishop Francis Silas Marean Chatard (born , died ) Bishop of Indianapolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, MD, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained BishopNorth American, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 320, and Page 592
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017