Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Frederick Ignatius Horstmann

Deceased

Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1840Born
10 Jun 186524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
14 Dec 189150.9AppointedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
25 Feb 189251.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
9 Mar 189251.2InstalledBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
13 May 190867.4DiedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary
John Frederick Ignatius Horstmann
Bishop John Frederick Ignatius Horstmann
(born , died )
Bishop of Cleveland

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, Diocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSaints Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Philadelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Death PlaceCleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Saint John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Cleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 210
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 24 May 2025