Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Camillo Santori

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fano, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1823Born
11 Apr 184622.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Dec 187754.5AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
1 Jan 187854.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
9 May 188258.9ResignedBishop of Fano, Italy
9 May 188258.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
19 Sep 188865.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Santori (VIAF: 89422476)
Archbishop Camillo Santori (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 268, and Page 511
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017