Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Andrea Miotti

Deceased

Bishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1822Born
15 Feb 184522.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 May 184522.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 188260.1AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
1 Oct 188260.1Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
28 Mar 189370.6DiedBishop of Parma (-Fontevivo), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Miotti (VIAF: 15663894)
Bishop Giovanni Andrea Miotti (born , died ) Bishop of Parma (-Fontevivo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaspoggio
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 442
  • c34: CB, 7 Oct 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast