Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Clari

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1836Born
18 Jun 185922.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 188246.0AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
1 Oct 188246.0Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
16 Jan 189356.3AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
9 Mar 189962.5DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Clari (VIAF: 88682919)
Bishop Eugenio Clari (born , died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSenigallia, Diocese of Senigallia
Ordained BishopTor dei Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 95, and Page 593
  • c34: CB, 7 Oct 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017