Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaele di Nonno, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1831BornCampobasso
25 Apr 184716.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
3 Mar 185524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
9 Aug 188352.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Termoli, Italy
9 Aug 188352.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
12 Aug 188352.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
12 Feb 188958.0SucceededBishop of Termoli, Italy
16 Jan 189361.9AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
26 Feb 189362.0InstalledArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
23 Jun 189564.4DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele di Nonno:
Archbishop Raffaele di Nonno C.SS.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 73, and Page 308
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 549
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013