Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Edward McDonnell

Deceased

Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1854Born
19 May 187824.2Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
11 Mar 189238.1AppointedBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
25 Apr 189238.2Ordained BishopBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
8 Aug 192167.5DiedBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Edward McDonnell (VIAF: 83632402)
Bishop Charles Edward McDonnell (born , died ) Bishop of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Death PlaceBrentwood
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. James, Pro-Cathedral, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Buried Place (Current)Bishops’ Crypt, Immaculate Conception Pastoral Center, Douglaston, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 20
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 336, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 459, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast